Zochlinski v. Regents of the University of California, et al
Plaintiff: Howard Alan Zochlinski
Defendant: Regents of the University of California, John Oakley and John Jones, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2010cv01824
Filed: July 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Yolo
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/1/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal (ECF No. 100 ) is DENIED; the Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on plaintiff and on the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. (cc USCA)(Becknal, R)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/16/2016 ORDERING that the court will defer consideration of plaintiff's pending 90 motion for sanctions, 91 motion to substitute, and 92 request to use electronic filing until after t he pending 83 findings and recommendations have been resolved. Defendants are not required to file an opposition or otherwise respond to plaintiff's motions or request until directed by the court to do so via subsequent order. The 3/17/2016 hearing regarding plaintiff's motion for sanctions and motion to substitute is VACATED. (Zignago, K.)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/1/15 ORDERING that Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to file objections to the court's 11/4/15 findings and recommendations (ECF No. 85 ) is GRANTED IN PART; Within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file objections, if any, to the court's 11/4/15 findings and recommendations. No further extensions of this deadline will be granted. (Becknal, R)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/4/15 ORDERING that Motion to appoint counsel 80 is denied. Within 30 days of the date of this order, defendants shall file and serve on plaintiff a formal statement of defendant John Jones, Jr.'s death. RECOMMENDING that Motions to dismiss the first amended complaint 72 be granted.This action be dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court be directed to vacate all dates and close this case.F&R referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Kaminski, H)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/15/2015 ORDERING that the hearing on defendant's 73 motion to dismiss is CONTINUED to 10/29/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Plaintiff shall file a written opposition to defendants' motion, or statement of non-opposition thereto, on or before 10/15/2015. Defendants may file a written reply to plaintiff's opposition, if any, on or before 10/22/2015. (Zignago, K.)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/19/15 ORDERING that Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time 67 is GRANTED; By no later than 5/6/15, plaintiff shall file either an amended complaint or a statement that he wishe s to proceed on his original complaint as modified by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals' opinion. Should plaintiff decide to file an amended complaint, the complaint shall contain the following claims only: (1) 42 U.S.C. § 1981 equal p rotection claim against John Jones, Jr.; (2) 42 U.S.C. § 1983 defamation plus claim against John Oakley and John Jones, Jr. to the extent that the claim is asserted against these defendants in their individual capacities; (3) defamation agains t all three defendants; (4) infliction of emotional distress against all three defendants; and (5) violations of California's Unruh Civil Rights Act against all three defendants. Plaintiff is again cautioned that allegations concerning ad ditional claims or against additional defendants asserted in an amended complaint, should plaintiff decide to file one, will be summarily disregarded; Defendants shall file response to plaintiff's complaint by no later than 5/27/15; Plaintiff's request for appointment of counsel is DENIED. (Becknal, R)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/12/15. The 8/11/11 46 Judgment is VACATED. Amended complaint or statement from plaintiff that he wishes to proceed on the original complaint due no later than 3/13/15. Response to complaint due no later than 4/10/15. (Manzer, C)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/16/12 ORDERING that Plaintiff's request for additional time to file a transcript designation 56 is denied as moot; and Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal 55 is denied. (Becknal, R)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 RELATED CASE 49 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 1/4/2012. Action denominated 2:11-CV-3295 MCE CKD is REASSIGNED to District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Moulds for all further proceedings. Henceforth, caption on documents filed shall be 2:11-CV-3295 KJM JFM. Clerk shall make appropriate adjustment to compensate for change. (Marciel, M)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/9/11 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION for a New Trial 47 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 6/7/2011 DENYING plaintiff's 40 41 Motions for Extensions of Time to file Reply Briefs. (Marciel, M)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds ORDERING pltf's motion to file a late briefing 16 DENIED; pltf's motion for appointment of counsel 18 DENIED; pltf's motion for extension of time 21 GRANTED; IT IS RECOMMENDED pltf's motion for remand to state court 17 be denied; dfts' motion to dismiss 6 be granted; leave to amend be denied; and this action be dismissed; REFERRED to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; objections may be filed within 14 days after being served with these F&R's.(Carlos, K)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 12/8/10, ORDERING that 27 pltf's request for permission to take photographs and/or videotape of the motion hearing set for 12/9/10 is DENIED.(Kastilahn, A)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 10/4/2010 ORDERING 14 Plaintiff's Opposition to defendants motion to dismiss due by 10/7/2010; dfts reply brief due by 10/21/2010; and Motion 6 to Dismiss Hearing reset for 11/4/2010 at 11:00 AM in 8th floor courtroom (JFM) before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds. (Reader, L)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 8/12/10: Plaintiff's August 4, 2010 motion is partially granted 7 . HEARING as to 6 MOTION to DISMISS continued to 10/7/2010 at 11:00 AM in 8th floor courtroom (JFM) before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zochlinski v. Regents of the University of California, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Alan Zochlinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regents of the University of California
Represented By: Gregory M. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Oakley
Represented By: Gregory M. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Jones, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory M. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?