Johnson v. Capa et al
Plaintiff: Scott N. Johnson
Defendant: Iris Capa, Ernest Fortino and Marie Fortino
Case Number: 2:2010cv01830
Filed: July 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 11/22/10 ORDERING that, per 14 Notice of Settlement, dispositional documents are to be filed by 12/13/10. All dates/hearings are VACATED. (Benson, A.)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 11/15/2010 ORDERING defendant Iris Capa is dismissed without prejudice. This case to remain open with remaining defendants. (Matson, R)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 11/10/2010 ORDERING Defendants' Counsel to SHOW CAUSE why he should not be sanctioned $150 for his failure to submit a Joint Status Report. Show Cause Response due by 11/24/2010. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/3/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr. (Krueger, M)(Krueger, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Capa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iris Capa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Fortino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Fortino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott N. Johnson
Represented By: Scott N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?