Sukup v. Mendez

Plaintiff: Thomas Martin Sukup
Defendant: John A. Mendez
Case Number: 2:2010cv01845
Filed: July 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 06/16/11 denying 22 plaintiff's 05/25/11 motion. Plaintiff is informed that no orders will issue in response to any future motions filed in this case. (Plummer, M)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Thomas Martin Sukup signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/19/10 ORDERING the Warden of FCI Beaumont Low shall collect monthly payments from plf's prison trust account with an initial amount of $237.10 until the $350 filing fee has been collected; Clerk to send this order and a copy of 5 IFP to Warden of FCI Beaumont Low; Clerk to serve Financial with a copy of this order (cc: Financial). (Benson, A.)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/22/2010 ORDERING that pltf's 2 application to proceed IFP is DISMISSED w/out prejudice; the clerk to send pltf a new ifp application; and pltf to submit, w/in 30 days, a completed ifp. (Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sukup v. Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Martin Sukup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?