United States of America v. Real property located at 3110 Morgan Hill Road, Hayfork, California, Trinity County, APN: 017-430-25
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real property located at 3110 Morgan Hill Road, Hayfork, California, Trinity County, APN: 017-430-25
Case Number: 2:2010cv01894
Filed: July 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 FINAL JUDGMENT 42 of FORFEITURE signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 3/29/2012. Each party shall be their own costs and attorneys fees except as provided for herein. Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce terms of this Judgment of Forfeiture. (Marciel, M)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 3/12/2012 ORDERING that the current Scheduling Conference date is VACATED in favor of 4/16/2012 at 2:00 p.m. before Honorable William B. Shubb. The parties' Joint Status Report shall be due on or before 4/2/2012. (Zignago, K.)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 1/10/12 ORDERING stay no longer pertinent; on or before 1/23/12, the parties will file a joint status report addressing the matters set forth in the 7/9/10 Order; the Scheduling Conference now set for 2/6/12 at 2:00 p.m. shall REMAIN scheduled as previously ordered. (Meuleman, A)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION and ORDER 32 for Stay signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 11/14/2011. This matter is STAYED for an additional 60 days. On or before 1/10/2012, parties will advise Court whether a further stay is necessary. The Pretrial Scheduling Conference set for 11/28/2011 is VACATED and RE-SCHEDULED to 2/6/2012 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS). A Joint Status Report is to be filed 14 days prior to hearing. (Marciel, M)
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 7/11/2011 ORDERING that this matter is STAYED until the conclusion of the related criminal case now pending in Trinity County Superior Court. Within 30 days after the criminal case has conclud ed, claimant Serrano will file his Answer to the Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem, and the parties will submit a joint status report. The Scheduling Conference is continued to 11/28/2011 at 2:00 p.m. A joint status report shall be filed no later 11/14/2011. (Zignago, K.)
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 06/27/11 ORDERING that this Stipulation for Expedited Settlement is hereby APPROVED. (Michel, G)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 12/17/10 ORDERING that this matter is STAYED until the conclusion of the related criminal case now pending in the Trinity County Superior Court. Within 30 days after the criminal case has conc luded claimants will file their Answer to the Complaint, and the parties will submit a joint status report addressing the matters set forth in the 7/19/10, Order Requiring Joint Status Report. The 1/10/11 Scheduling Conference is VACATED and reset for 7/25/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Owen, K)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION, signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/20/10. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real property located at 3110 Morgan Hill Road, Hayfork, California, Trinity County, APN: 017-430-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kristin S. Door
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real property located at 3110 Morgan Hill Road, Hayfork, California, Trinity County, APN: 017-430-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?