Ryland Homes of California, Inc. v. Eagle Meadows of California, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ryland Homes of California, Inc.
Defendant: Eagle Meadows of California, LLC, The Village in Duck Creek Estates, LLC, Kent Hoggan, Specialty Mortgage Corporation, Catamount Management, LLC, Bradley P. Johnson, Thomas R. Friebel and Specialty Trust, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv01908
Filed: July 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 (a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/31/2012 DISMISSING CASE in its entirety, with prejudice, pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); DIRECTING each party to bear its own fees and costs. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/7/10 ORDERING that case is hereby administratively stayed pending resolution of any bankruptcy issues in the United States District Court, District of Nevada, and the parties are to file a Joint Status Report every sixty (60) days until said resolution. The Clerk is ordered to administratively close the case and/or remove it from the Courts open case files pending further order of the Court. CASE CLOSED. (Duong, D)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/10/10 ORDERING dfts' Motion for Transfer of Venue 9 is DENIED; the case is administratively STAYED pending resolution of dfts bankruptcy issues in front of the US Bankruptcy Court, District o f Nevada, and the parties are to file Joint Status Reports every 60 days until the bankruptcy case is resolved. Parties have 20 days from the electronic filing of this order to object. Upon no objections, the Clerk will be ordered to administratively close the case and remove it from the Courts open case files.(Carlos, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryland Homes of California, Inc. v. Eagle Meadows of California, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryland Homes of California, Inc.
Represented By: Darrin M. Menezes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Meadows of California, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Village in Duck Creek Estates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Hoggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialty Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Bryan Matthew Kreft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catamount Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley P. Johnson
Represented By: Charles A Koss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas R. Friebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialty Trust, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Matthew Kreft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?