Woods v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kevin Glenn Woods
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2010cv02031
Filed: July 29, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 5/6/2014 ORDERING that the Findings and Recommendations are ADOPTED. Plaintiff's counsel's 34 motion for attorney's fees is GRANTED. Plaintiff's counsel is awarded $12,434.50 in fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 406(b). (Zignago, K.)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/4/2014 RECOMMENDING 34 MOTION for ATTORNEY FEES Pursuant To 42 U.S.C Section 406(b) filed by Kevin Glenn Woods be granted and plaintiff's counsel be awar ded $12,434.50 in fees. Motion referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. Any party may file objections to these findings and recommendations within 14 days after being served. Failure to file objections within the specified time may waive the right to appeal the District Court's order. (Waggoner, D)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 6/25/2012 ORDERING 32 that Plaintiff be awarded attorney fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28:2412(d), in the amount of $5,500.00; this amount represents compensation for all legal services rendered on behalf of Plaintiff by counsel in connection with this civil action, in accordance with 28:1920, 2412(d). (Reader, L)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 3/27/12 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 3/7/12 28 are ADOPTED. Plaintiff's MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 21 is GRANTED. The Commissioner's MOTION for Summary Judgment 24 is DENIED. This Case is REMANDED for payment of benefits. The Clerk is directed to enter Judgment in Pliantiff's favor and close the case. CASE CLOSED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/7/2012 RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's 21 motion for summary judgment be granted; the Commissioner's 24 motion for summary judgment be denied; this case be remanded for payment of benefits; and the clerk be directed to enter judgment in plaintiff's favor. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections due within 14 days.(Yin, K)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/22/2011 EXTENDING Plaintiff's Time to Reply to Defendant's 24 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment pursuant to 25 Stipulation and Proposed Order. Plaintiff's 26 Reply is deemed timely filed. (Michel, G)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/13/11 ORDERING the time for responding to pltf's motion for summary judgment 21 is EXTENDED 45 days to 7/24/11. (Carlos, K)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/17/11 ORDERING that the pltf shall file his response to the dft's answer on or before 5/9/11. (Manzer, C)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/15/11 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall file his response on or before 4/7/2011. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/3/10: The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve the undersigned's scheduling order in Social Security cases. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on States Marshal. (Kaminski, H)(cc: USM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Glenn Woods
Represented By: Ann M. Cerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?