Yeager v. Aviat Aircraft, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Charles E. Yeager
Defendant: Aviat Aircraft, Inc. and Stuart Horn
Case Number: 2:2010cv02055
Filed: August 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/09/11 ORDERING that defendants' 52 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in its entirety, and as to all causes of action asserted by Plaintiff and as to all relief sought by Plaintiff in this action; and Judgment shall be entered in favor of Defendants in this action. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/20/11 DENYING without prejudice 73 Motion for Reimbursement of Expert Fees. (Meuleman, A)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER 38 signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 2/2/2011. Any materials stamped "Confidential Subject to Protective Order" shall be filed with Court UNDER SEAL pursuant to Local Rule. (Marciel, M)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/19/10: Defendant's 17 MOTION to QUASH is DENIED. (Kaminski, H)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/1/10 ORDERING that Defendant Aviat Aircraft, Inc.'s time to file its response to the complaint is extended by 28 days until 9/29/10. (Becknal, R)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF NON-RELATED CASES signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 8/9/2010 ORDERING that Judge Damrell declines to relate cases CIV. S-07-2571 FCD GGH and CIV. S-10-2055 JAM EFB. Therefore, CIV. S-10-2055 JAM EFB shall not be reassigned. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yeager v. Aviat Aircraft, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E. Yeager
Represented By: Joanna Rae Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aviat Aircraft, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?