Self v. Chase Bank (USA) N.A.
Plaintiff: Brandon T Self
Defendant: Chase Bank (USA) N.A.
Case Number: 2:2010cv02199
Filed: August 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/24/11: Recommending that 26 MOTION to DISMISS be granted. All other pending motions be denied. F&R are referred to United States District Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr.. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Kaminski, H)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 2/8/2011 re 26 32 ORDERING that the hearing is hereby taken off calendar and the matter is submitted on the record and briefs without oral argument.(Duong, D)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/16/2010 ORDERING that the status/scheduling conferences set in these matters for January 13, 2011, before the undersigned in Redding, California, are taken off calendar pending resolution of defendants' motions to dismiss, currently set for hearing on February 10, 2011. (Duong, D)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/15/10 ORDERING that deft's 15 Motion to Dismiss and 18 Motion to Strike are STRICKEN and taken off calendar. Deft shall file a response to the amended complaint within 30 days. (Owen, K)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/29/10, ORDERING that the hearing as to 18 Motion to Strike, and 15 Motion to Dismiss is hereby MOVED to 12/1/2010 at 10:00 AM in Redding (CMK) before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. (Kastilahn, A)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/22/10 ORDERING that plf's 13 Motion to Amend the Complaint is DENIED as unnecessary. (Benson, A.)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 9/20/2010 ORDERING that action denominated, CIV S-10-2200 JAM CMK PS is reassigned to Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. for further proceedings, and any dates currently set in this reassigned case before Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. are hereby VACATED. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as: CIV S-10-2200 FCD CMK PS. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment.(Duong, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Self v. Chase Bank (USA) N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon T Self
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank (USA) N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?