Nelson et al v. Unum Group et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Nelson and Richard R. Nelson
Defendant: Unum Group, Unum Life Insurance Company of America and Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2010cv02222
Filed: August 18, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 635
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/16/2011 ORDERING that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a). CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/9/2011 ORDERING that the hearing date for dfts' 19 motion for summary judgment is CONTINUED to 6/15/2011. (Zignago, K.)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 1/5/11 that defendants shall have through and including 3/1/11 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint and the parties shall have until on or before 3/15/11 to file a Joint Status Report. Furthermore, the mediation with Robert Kaplan that the parties agreed to complete on 12/8/10, was continued and will now be completed on or before 3/1/11. (Becknal, R)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/18/2010 ORDERING 8 that defendants shall have through and including 1/7/2011 to file their joint status report. (Reader, L)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/23/2010 ORDERING that dfts shall have through 12/24/2010 to answer or otherwise to the complaint. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson et al v. Unum Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Nelson
Represented By: Michael Brian Horrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard R. Nelson
Represented By: Michael Brian Horrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Group
Represented By: Anna M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Anna M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Anna M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?