Martin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: James Martin
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2010cv02226
Filed: August 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/21/2013 ORDERING 13 it is therefore appropriate to REOPEN this case in order to resolve the Court's sentence-six jurisdiction. Upon reopening, the parties stipulate that judgment should be entered for plaintiff. IT IS SO ORDERED Judgment shall be ENTERED in favor of Plaintiff. CASE REOPENED (Reader, L)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER REMANDING CASE to the Commissioner of Social Security signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/29/11. (Kaminski, H)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/13/2010 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 2 request to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve the undersigned's scheduling order in social securi ty cases. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal. Within fifteen days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the United States Marshal an original and five copies of the completed summons, five copies of the complaint, five copies of the scheduling order and a completed USM-285 form and shall file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the United States Marshal. The United States Marshal is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than sixty days from the date of this order. (cc USM)(Duong, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Martin
Represented By: Bess M. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?