Johnson v. Rocklin Park Hotel, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Scott N. Johnson
Defendant: Rocklin Park Hotel, LLC, Spa Lale, Inc. and Boroski & Borowski Two, LLC
Case Number: 2:2010cv02324
Filed: August 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/17/10: The dispositional documents disposing of the case shall be filed no later than thirty (30)days from the effective date of this order. All hearing dates heretofore set in this matter are hereby VACATED. (Kaminski, H)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/15/2010 ORDERING 12 Boroski & Borowski Two, LLC are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. (Reader, L)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/12/10 GRANTING 7 request to dismiss with prejudice defendant Spa Lale, Inc. This case remains open with remaining defendants.(Williams, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Rocklin Park Hotel, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocklin Park Hotel, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spa Lale, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boroski & Borowski Two, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott N. Johnson
Represented By: Scott N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?