Hoffman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Valentina Peralta Hoffman
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2010cv02377
Filed: September 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/24/2012. Plaintiff's 20 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED and defendant's 24 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is AFFIRMED. (Marciel, M)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 07/05/2011 ORDERING that Response to the 20 Motion for Summary Judgment is due by 8/1/2011. (Michel, G)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/15/11 ORDERING the time in which pltf may file a motion for summary judgment and/or remand of the Commissioner's Final Decision is EXTENDED to 6/1/11. (Carlos, K)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/24/11: The new date for filing the Answer and Notice of Filing Social Security Administrative Transcript is March 30, 2011. (Kaminski, H)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/13/10: Plaintiff shall show good cause in writing, within fourteen days after this order is filed, for failing to file a consent or request for reassignment form. Prompt filing of a completed form will be deemed full compliance with this order. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoffman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valentina Peralta Hoffman
Represented By: Richard Allen Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?