Delgado v. CDCR Medical Health Care Department, et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Delgado
Defendant: CDCR Medical Health Care Department, K. Daly, Verga, Val, J Wedell, Duk, Liamcar, Dave Russell, J. Ball, Sahoto and Cardeno
Case Number: 2:2010cv02379
Filed: September 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/22/11 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice due to petitioners failure to keep the court apprised of his current address; referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 04/20/11 ordering that hereinafter, Susan E. Coleman, Esq. of Burke, Williams & Sorenson LLP will serve as counsel of record for defendant James Wedell in this action. (Plummer, M)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/22/2011 ORDERING that dft's 21 motion to dismiss, to which pltf accedes, is GRANTED, pltf's claim that dft Wedell denied pltf a special medical diet is DISMISSED from this action; this case shall proceed on pltf's remaining contentions in support of his Eighth Amendement claims agianst dft Wedell; and dft shall file and serve an answer to the cmplt on or before 4/1/2011. (Yin, K)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/20/10 ORDERING that dft's 17 Request for Extension of Time is GRANTED; dft has until 01/19/11 to file a responsive pleading. (Benson, A.)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/9/2010 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 11 are ADOPTED in FULL; and defendants Cardeno, K. Daly, Duk, Liamcar, Dave Russell, Sahoto, Val, Verga, J. Ball and CDCR Medical Health Care Department are DISMISSED without prejudice from this action. (Reader, L)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/1/2010 ORDERING the clerk to randomly assign a district judge to this case; and RECOMMENDING that dfts CDCR Medical Health Care Department, Daly, Verga, Val, Duk, Liamcar, D. Russell, J. Ball, Sahuto and Cardeno be dismissed w/out prejudice. Assigned and Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections due w/in 21 days. (Yin, K)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of JOSEPH DELGADO signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/13/2010. CDC is to collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance and fwd to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of pltf's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial w/ a copy of this order. (cc: CDC, Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delgado v. CDCR Medical Health Care Department, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR Medical Health Care Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Val
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Wedell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liamcar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sahoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardeno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?