Wooten v. Sokohou
Plaintiff: Mario Ngwazi Wooten
Defendant: Mike Gregory Sokohou
Case Number: 2:2010cv02382
Filed: September 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/18/10 ORDERING that 6 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS are VACATED; RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice as duplicative of Case No. CIV S-10-2138 DAD; 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Mario Ngwazi Wooten referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 21 days.(Dillon, M)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/26/10 ORDERING the Clerk of the Court shall randomly assign a U.S. District Judge to this action. U.S. District Judge Morrison C. England randomly assigned to this action. Also, RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/4/2010 ORDERING pltf to submit, w/in 30 days, a completed affidavit to proceed ifp w/ a certified trust acct statement; and the clerk to send pltf a new ifp form. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wooten v. Sokohou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Ngwazi Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Gregory Sokohou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?