Zinnel vs CitiMortgage Inc.

Plaintiff: Steven K Zinnel
Defendant: CitiMortgage Inc. and CR Title Services Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv02406
Filed: September 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/9/11: Ordering that the parties' requests for judicial notice are granted solely with regard to public records and are otherwise denied. Recommending that 21 Motion to Dismiss be granted. Motion referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.. Objections to F&R due within fourteen days. (Kaminski, H)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/10/10 ORDERING that a Settlement Conference is SET for 02/17/11 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DAD) before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd; the parties shall file waivers of disqualification w/i 30 da ys; the parties shall submit confidential settlement statements as directed in the (#43) 12/10/10 minutes; dfts' 21 Motion to Dismiss is CONTINUED and will be re-set for hearing if the case does not settle; plf's 38 Motion to Enforce a Subpoena is DENIED w/o prejudice as premature; plf's 40 Motion to Amend the Complaint is DENIED w/o prejudice to consideration of the request in the context of dfts' Motion to Dismiss; plf's discovery motion and motion to amend are DROPPED from the Court's 01/14/11 calendar; and all discovery is temporarily STAYED pending completion of the settlement conference and, if the case does not settle, pending disposition of dfts' motion to dismiss. (Benson, A.)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 11/10/10 ORDERING the Findings and Recommendations 20 are ADOPTED IN FULL; and pltf's motion for a temporary restraining order 10 is DENIED AS MOOT. (Carlos, K)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/4/2010 ORDERING that Pltf's 16 Motion for leave to file documents electronically is GRANTED. Pltf's 17 Motion for an order allowing him to record a notice of lis pendens is DENIED without prejudice. Pltf's 16 and 17 Motions are dropped from the Court's 11/12/2010 law and motion calendar. (Zignago, K.)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/13/10 RECOMMENDING that plf's 10 Motion for TRO be denied as moot. Objections to these F&Rs due w/i 7 days; referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. (Benson, A.)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 09/15/10 DENYING 5 Motion for TRO. (Williams, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zinnel vs CitiMortgage Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven K Zinnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR Title Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?