United States of America v. Lopez

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Maria Lopez
Case Number: 2:2010cv02438
Filed: September 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 02/08/11 ADOPTING 16 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; GRANTING (4) Motion to Remand on the ground that this court lacks jurisdicitoin over plaintiff's claims; REMANDING CASE to Superior Court of California, County of Sacramento. Copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED.(Williams, D)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/15/2010 RECOMMENDING that plaintiffs 4 motion to remand be granted and that this matter be remanded to the Superior Court of California, County of Sacramento, on the grounds that this court lacks federal subject matter jurisdiction over plaintiff's claims; Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections due 14 days after being served with these F & R's. (Reader, L)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/17/10 ORDERING that Defendant shall file and serve a written opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to remand, or statement of non-opposition to the granting of the Motion to remand, on or befor e 12/09/10. Defendant's failure to file an opposition will be construed as a statement of non-opposition to Plaintiff's Motion and will result in a recommendation that Plaintiff's Motion be granted and this matter be remanded to State Court. Plaintiff may file and serve a written reply to defendant's opposition brief, on or before 12/23/2010. The Court will set a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to remand if it determines that one is necessary. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 09/28/10 ORDERING that dft's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED; dft shall file an opposition or statement of non-opposition to plf's 4 Motion to Remand by 10/14/10; any reply brief by plf is due by 10/21/10; the court will set a hearing on the motion if necessary. (Benson, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: David R. Endres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?