Penn v. U.S. Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: Marlin Penn
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice, Richard Huff, Priscilla Jones, Jessie Price and Bureau of A.T.F. & E
Case Number: 2:2010cv02494
Filed: September 15, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 3/27/12 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 3/7/12 56 are ADOPTED. The DOJ's MOTION TO DISMISS Defendants ATF, Huff, Jones, and Price 35 is GRANTED. The DOJ's MOTION to DI SMISS Plaintiff's fourth and fifh FOIA claim is GRANTED. The DOJ's MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT on Plaintiff's first, second, and third FOIA claims is GRANTED. Plaintiff's REQUESTS to amend and for a Stay of this case is DENIED; and The Clerk is directed to enter Judgment for the DOJ and close this case. CASE CLOSED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/7/2012 ORDERING the status conference set for 5/30/2012 is VACATED;Plaintiff's Request for Appointment of Counsel 40 , 49 , 52 , 54 , 55 are DENIED; R ECOMMENDING The DOJs motion to dismiss defendants ATF, Huff, Jones, and Price be granted; The DOJs motion to dismiss plaintiffs fourth and fifth FOIA claims be granted;The DOJs motion for summary judgment on plaintiffs first, second, and third FOIA c laims be granted; Plaintiffs requests to amend and for a stay of this case be denied; and The Clerk be directed to enter judgment for the DOJ and close this case. 35 MOTION for DISMISSAL and SUMMARY JUDGMENT referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections may be filed within 14 days from the date of service of these findings and recommendations. (Waggoner, D)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/6/11 DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 32 and 36 Motions and ORDERING Plaintiff to file an opposition or a statement of non-opposition to 35 MOTION for DISMISSAL and SUMMARY JUDGMENT on or before 7/27/11 and defendant's reply to plaintiff's opposition, if any, due on or before 8/10/11. (Meuleman, A)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/12/11 ORDERING that plaintiff's motion for the appointment of counsel 26 is denied without prejudice; and Plaintiff's motion to amend 27 is denied without prejudice. (Becknal, R)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Marlin Penn signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/14/2011. CDC is to collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance and fwd to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of pltf's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial w/ a copy of this order. (cc: CDC, Financial)(Yin, K)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/27/2010 ORDERING that pltf has 30 days to submit either the filing fee or an ifp application; the clerk to mail pltf an ifp form.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penn v. U.S. Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlin Penn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Huff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priscilla Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessie Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of A.T.F. & E
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?