Hirschy v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Terry Hirschy
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2010cv02520
Filed: September 17, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Butte
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/23/2012. Plaintiff's 15 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED and defendant's 20 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Clerk directed to enter Judgment and CLOSE this file. (Marciel, M)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/6/11 ORDERING that Defendant shall have a SECOND extension of 14 days to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 15 . The new due date will be 6/17/2011. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/5/11 ORDERING the new date for dft to respond to pltf's motion for summary judgment is 6/3/11. (Carlos, K)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/30/11: Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before April 6, 2011. (Kaminski, H)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 2/9/2011 ORDERING that Pltf's motion for summary judgment shall be filed by 3/7/2011. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hirschy v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Hirschy
Represented By: Joseph Clayton Fraulob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?