Smith v. CMF SP Mental Evaluation Division et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth A. Smith
Defendant: CMF SP Mental Evaluation Division and CMF Mental Health Evaluators
Case Number: 2:2010cv02541
Filed: September 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/20/2011 ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED w/out prejudice for lack of prosecution and failure to comply w/ court rules and orders; all pending motions are DENIED as moot; and the clerk to enter judgment and close this file. CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/8/10 ORDERING that plaintiff shall show cause in writing, within 30 days of the date of this order, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to file an amended complaint.(Dillon, M)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/26/10 ORDERING that plf's 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint is DISMISSED w/ leave to amend; plf shall file an amended complaint w/i 30 days. (Benson, A.)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/30/2010. (Matson, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. CMF SP Mental Evaluation Division et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMF SP Mental Evaluation Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMF Mental Health Evaluators
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?