Saunders v. The Law Offices of Elaine Van Beveren et al
Plaintiff: Robert Saunders
Defendant: The Law Offices of Elaine Van Beveren and Elaine Van Beveren
Case Number: 2:2010cv02559
Filed: September 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 3/23/2012 ORDERING plaintiff's IFP status should continue for 51 Appeal. The Clerk shall promptly transmit a copy of this order to Court of Appeals. (cc: USCA) (Waggoner, D)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 3/9/2012 DENYING 49 "Objections to the District Court Dismissal of this Case" construed as a Request for Reconsideration or Relief from Judgment. (Michel, G)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 1/3/12 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike 38 is DENIED. However, Plaintiff's arguments stated in his Motion to Strike will be considered in reviewing the Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendations. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/5/11 recommending that Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint be dismissed with prejudice 27 . The Clerk be directed to close this case. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to U.S. District Court Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. Objections to these F&R due within fourteen days. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/14/2011. The 10/20/2011 Hearing notice by plaintiff is VACATED. (Marciel, M)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/7/11 CONTINUING Status (pretrial scheduling) Conference to 12/8/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Meuleman, A)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/28/2011 DENYING 23 Objections to Findings and Recommendations, construed as a Request that the undersigned disqualify himself from presiding over this action on the basis of alleged judicial bias. (Michel, G)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER adopting 22 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 9/5/11. Defendants Elaine Van Beveren and the Law Offices of Elaine Van Beveren's motion to dismiss 13 is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's claims for relief brought pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1983 and alleged against defendants Elaine Van Beveren and the Law Offices of Elaine Van Beveren are dismissed with prejudice. Within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint. (Kastilahn, A)
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/13/2011. Defendants Elaine Van Beveren's and Law Offices of Elaine Van Beveren's Request for Judicial Notice is GRANTED but their Request for Court to decline jurisdiction of plaintiff's claims is HELD in ABEYANCE. Plaintiff need not serve Second Amended Complaint on County. Defendant County of Sacramento's 15 Motion to Quash is DENIED as MOOT and hearing on said Motion is VACATED. Cour t is also RECOMMENDING defendants' 13 Motion to Dismiss be granted in part; and plaintiff's claims for relief alleged against defendants Elaine Van Beveren and Law Offices of Elaine Van Beveren be dismissed with prejudice. Within 14 days after being served with these F/Rs, any party may file written Objections and serve copy on all parties. Status Conference set for 10/13/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN). (Marciel, M)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/9/11: Service of plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is appropriate for Elaine Van Beveren, an individual, and the Law Offices of Elain Van Beveren. The Clerk of the Court is directed to is sue forthwith all process. The Clerk of Court shall send plaintiff two USM-285 forms, one summons, an endorsed copy of the First Amended Complaint, this court's scheduling order, and the forms providing notice of the magistrate judge's availability to exercise jurisdiction for all purposes. (Kaminski, H)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/1/10. Pltf's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Pltf is GRANTED 45 days from the date of this order to file a first amended complaint. Pltf may not represent the two minors in this action without retaining a lawyer to represent them, and pltf shall have 45 days from the date of service of this order to retain a lawyer.(Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saunders v. The Law Offices of Elaine Van Beveren et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Law Offices of Elaine Van Beveren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine Van Beveren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?