Quickframe Systems, Inc. v. Godina
Plaintiff: Quickframe Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Anthony J. Godina
Case Number: 2:2010cv02599
Filed: September 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/11/11 ORDERING the 19 Order to Show Cause is discharged. (Matson, R)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 JUDGMENT FOR MONEY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF dated *7/6/11* signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/6/11 ORDERING that Defendant shall pay Plaintiff the sum of $7,500, due and payable forthwith, but subject to an agreed stay of execution by Plaintiff for a period of six months following the date of entry of this judgment. Except as stated here, each party will bear their own costs. (Becknal, R)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/6/11 ORDERING defendant to COMPLY with 15 & 18 Orders by 6/21/11. By 6/21/11, defendant shall SHOW CAUSE in writing why he should not be sanctioned for violating court orders and file written statment confirming his consent to the undersigned serving as the settlement conference judge and waiving disqualification. (Donati, J) Modified on 6/7/2011 (Donati, J).
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/16/11 ORDERING that by 5/26/11, defendant is ordered to file a writing explaining his failure to timely comply with the court's order dated 4/28/11, and showing cause whyhe should not be sa nctioned for violating a court order. Also by 5/26/11, defendant is again ordered to file the "Consent to/Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge" form, which is available both from the Clerk's Office and from the court's docket in this matter at Docket Number 9 . Finally, by 5/26/11, defendant is again ordered to file a written statement confirming his consent to the undersigned serving as the settlement judge and waivingdisqualification in accordance with Local Rul e 270(b). Defendant's failure to comply with this order by 5/26/11, may result in sanctions and may cause the settlement conference set for 6/28/11, to be vacated. Should defendant fail to comply with this order by 5/26/11, the court will issue a Status (PretrialScheduling) Order setting the matter for trial before the district judge. (Becknal, R)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Judge Kendall J. Newman on 02/14/11 DENYING pursuant to Eastern District Local Rule 271(a)(2)(ii) the parties request for referral to the Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program. (Williams, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quickframe Systems, Inc. v. Godina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quickframe Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Glenn W. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. Godina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?