United States of America v. Real Property Located at 28953 State Highway 49, North San Juan, California
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property Located at 28953 State Highway 49, North San Juan, California
Case Number: 2:2010cv02614
Filed: September 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER for DISMISSAL re: 25 signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/3/14 and CERTIFICATE of Reasonable Cause. (Meuleman, A)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/22/10 ORDERING Case stayed until the conclusion of the criminal case. (Williams, D)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER 4 for Publication signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/28/2010. (Marciel, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property Located at 28953 State Highway 49, North San Juan, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Saralyn M. Ang-Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 28953 State Highway 49, North San Juan, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?