LaTourelle v. Barber et al
Plaintiff: Ruth LaTourelle
Defendant: Terry Barber, Wayne Virag, County of Siskiyou and Siskiyou County Board of Supervisors
Case Number: 2:2010cv02667
Filed: September 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge David O. Carter on 10/13/2015 ORDERING that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice and without an award of costs or fees. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION and ORDER 89 requesting Settlement Conference signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/30/2015. Based on Stipulation of parties, this matter is REFERRED to Alternative Dispute Resolution Division to schedule a Settlement Conf erence before a Magistrate Judge. Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison will issue a Scheduling Order for the Settlement Conference, and counsel is instructed to have a principal with full settlement authority present at Conference or be fully authorized to settle matter on any terms. Parties are ordered to file Status Reports with Court not later than 7 days after conclusion of Settlement Conference. (Marciel, M)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2015 at 2:00 p.m. and Jury Trial set for 12/14/2015 at 9:00 a.m., both in Courtroom 7. Signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/18/2015. (Deutsch, S)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL. 2/5/2015 Final Pretrial Conference vacated and continued to 4/2/2015 at 2:00 p.m. 4/13/2015 jury trial vacated and continued to 5/11/2015 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 01/07/2015. (Deutsch, S)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/9/2014 CONTINUING the Jury Trial to 4/13/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; ORDERING that trial briefs be filed by 1/22/2015; CONTINUING the Final Pretrial Conference to 2/5/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; ORDERING that the Joint Final Pretrial Statement be filed by 1/15/2015 in compliance with the procedured outlined in th e 41 Scheduling Order; ORDERING that any evidentiary or procedural motions be filed by 1/15/2015; ORDERING that oppositions be filed by 1/22/2015; ORDERING that any replies be filed by 1/29/2015; ENCOURAGING the parties to consider consenting to a jury or non-jury trial before the assigned Magistrate Judge as well as availing themselves of the Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution programs. (Michel, G)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/13/2014 ORDERING 75 Settlement Conference set for 6/11/2014 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman; Parties are instructed to have a principal with full settlement authority present at the Settlement Conference or to be fully authorized to settle the matter on any terms; The parties are directed to exchange non-confidential settlement statements 7 days prior to the settlement conference.(Reader, L)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/22/2014 CONTINUING the Jury Trial to 1/12/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; ORDERING that trial briefs be filed by 10/30/2014; CONTINUING the Final Pretrial Conference to 11/13/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; ORDERING that the Joint Final Pretrial Statement be filed by 10/23/2014; ORDERING that any evidentiary or procedural motions be filed by 10/23/2014; ORDERING that oppositions be filed by 10/30/2014; ORDERING that any replies be filed by 11/6/2014. (Michel, G)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/28/2014 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 45 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING 60 Motion to Amend the Second Amended Complaint. (Michel, G)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 10/31/12: Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 2/3/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Trial briefs due not later than 11/21/2013; Fin al Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 12/5/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Joint Final Pretrial Statement due not later than 11/14/2013; Any evidentiary or procedural motions are to be filed by 11 /14/2013, oppositions must be filed by 11/21/2013, and reply must be filed by 11/28/20/13. The motions will be heard by the Court at the same time as the Final Pretrial Conference. All other due dates set forth in the Court's Pretrial Scheduling Order are confirmed. (Kastilahn, A)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/8/2012 DENYING plaintiff's 35 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis as UNNECESSARY. All parties shall appear by counsel or in person if acting without an attorney. Parties shall submit to Court and serve by mail on all other parties, no leter than 7 days before Conference, a Status/Scheduling Report. (Marciel, M)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/30/12 EXTENDING plaintiff's deadline of filing second amended complaint to 5/14/12. (Meuleman, A)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/25/12 ORDERING that, if plaintiff filed a timely second amended complaint, defendants' response thereto shall be due by May 31, 2012. (Becknal, R)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ADOPTING 27 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, in full except as outlined with respect to 6th Claim, signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/28/2012. Plaintiff's 19 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and add new 7th Claim is GRANTED. Defendants' 21 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The 3rd, 4th, 5th, and 6th Claims are DISMISSED with leave to amend. The 8th Claim is DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiff shall file a Second Amended Complaint within 30 days of due date of this Order. (Marciel, M)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/23/12 RECOMMENDING that Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend 19 to add the new 7th Claim be granted; Defendants' motion to dismiss 21 should be granted in p art and denied in part; the 3rd, 4th, 5th, and 8th Claims be dismissed with leave to amend because plaintiff failed to allege compliance with the state's Tort Claims Act; The 1st Claim is limited to allegations of discrimination addressed in the right-to-sue letter; The 8th Claim should be dismissed with prejudice; and Plaintiff should be provided an opportunity to file a second amended complaint to allege compliance with the state's Tort Claims Act in a single pleading. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Becknal, R)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/19/2011 re 17 ORDERING that the 16 Ex Parte Application for extension of time is GRANTED. Plt's time to file her amended complaint is EXTENDED to May 16, 2011. Defendants' time to file a responsive pleading to plaintiff's amended complaint (whether filed on or before May 16, 2011) is EXTENDED to May 31, 2011. (Duong, D)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/31/11: 11 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS are adopted in part and rejected in part. 5 Motion to Dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. 6 Motion for Extension of time is denied. Defendant Wayne Virag is dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the date this order is electronically filed. (Kaminski, H)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/20/2011 RECOMMENDING 6 that Plaintiff's request for a continuance be denied; 5 dfts' motion to dismiss be granted in part and denied in part; pltf's 1st , 2nd, and 5th Claims be dismissed in their entirety with prejudice; 4th Claim be dismissed with prejudice except pltf's claim against dft Barber relating to allegedly retaliatory conduct occurring between 9/30/08 and 9/30/10; and 6th and 7th Claims be dismissed with leave to amend; and dft Virag be dismissed with prejudice. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections due 14 days after being served with these F & R's. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaTourelle v. Barber et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth LaTourelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Virag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Siskiyou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siskiyou County Board of Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?