Magana-Torres v Harrington
Petitioner: Jose Humberto Magana-Torres
Respondent: Kelly Harrington
Case Number: 2:2010cv02669
Filed: September 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 05/07/19 DENYING 43 Motion for Extension of time because the court has declined to issue a certificate of appealability and DENYING 50 Motion to Proceed IFP without prejudice to seeking relief as necessary in the appellate court. (cc: USCA, 9th circuit) (Plummer, M)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 04/05/19 DECLINING to issue COA (cc: USCA). (Benson, A.)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/1/19 DENYING 39 petitioner's motion for relief from judgment. (Kastilahn, A)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 02/14/19 DENYING 34 Motion to Proceed IFP. (cc: USCA, 9th circuit) (Plummer, M)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Bommer on 2/9/12; Petitioner's request filed February 8, 2012 for an extension of time is GRANTED; Petitioner shall file his objections to the Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendations on or before March 12, 2012; and Counsel's motion to withdraw is GRANTED.(Matson, R)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Bommer on 12/19/11 ORDERING that petitioner's request for an evidentiary hearing is DENIED and RECOMMENDING that the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas be denied. Objections to these F&Rs due within 21 days; referred to Judge William B. Shubb. (Benson, A.)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/20/2011 DENYING as unnecessary, ptnr's 15 request to proceed IFP. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magana-Torres v Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Humberto Magana-Torres
Represented By: Hilda E. Scheib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kelly Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?