Lindgren v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Marla Millard Lindgren
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2010cv02818
Filed: October 18, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/10/14 ORDERING that t Plaintiff's MOTION 21 is GRANTED and counsel is awarded attorney fees in the amount of $4,951.50, minus the amount of $3,100.00 in EAJA fees to be reimbursed to Plaintiff, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 406(b)(1)(A). (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/6/11. Plaintiff is AWARDED attorney's fees in the amount of Three-Thousand One-Hundred Dollars and no Cents ($3,100.00), and Court costs in the amount of Three-Hundred Fifty Dollars and No Cents ($350.00), subject to the terms of the Stipulation.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/15/11 ORDERING this case REMANDED to the Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to Sentence Four and final judgment shall be entered in favor of pltf and against dft reversing the final decision of the Commissioner. CASE CLOSED. (Carlos, K)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/5/11 ORDERING that the Request for Extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The new due date will be 4/25/2011. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindgren v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marla Millard Lindgren
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?