Ash v. Bank of America
Plaintiff: Mimi Ash
Defendant: Bank of America Corp.
Case Number: 2:2010cv02821
Filed: October 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/27/14. (Kaminski, H)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/16/14 ORDERING that pursuant to the parties' 81 stipulation, the matter is referred to VDRP with a dispute resolution to take place prior to the trial, but only after the issuance of this Court's Decision and Order on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment but at least two weeks prior to trial. (Kastilahn, A)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/11/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend 59 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/20/12. (Matson, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ash v. Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mimi Ash
Represented By: Joseph W. Creed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?