Merrida v. Aramark Food Service Provider, et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Merrida
Defendant: Aramark Food Service Provider and Solano County
Case Number: 2:2010cv02865
Filed: October 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 02/16/11 recommending that this action be dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Dennis Merrida signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/10/2010 ORDERING monthly payments to be collected and forwarded to the Clerk of Court. The Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the order granting IFP, and a copy of Pltf's IFP to Solano County Sheriff's Dept. (cc: Financial) (Zignago, K.)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/29/2010 ORDERING pltf to submit, w/in 30 days, a complete ifp application or the appropriate filing fee; and the clerk to send pltf a new ifp form.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merrida v. Aramark Food Service Provider, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Merrida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Food Service Provider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solano County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?