Brown v. Swarthout
Petitioner: Jeffrick Brown
Respondent: Gary Swarthout
Case Number: 2:2010cv02879
Filed: October 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/02/11 denying 27 Motion to Appoint Counsel to renewing the request in the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. The clerk of the court is directed to terminate all pending motions in this closed docket. (Plummer, M)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/22/11 RECOMMENDING that 14 MOTION to DISMISS be granted. Referred to Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/13/10 granting 8 Motion to Proceed IFP. (Dillon, M)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/9/10 ORDERING that Petitioner shall submit on the form provided by the Clerk of the Court, within 30 days from the date of this order, a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with the certification required by Rule 3(a)(2), or pay the appropriate filing fee; and Clerk of the Court is directed to send petitioner a new form Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Swarthout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffrick Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gary Swarthout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?