Soroka v. Extended Stay, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James Soroka
Defendant: Extended Stay, Inc. and HVM L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2010cv02883
Filed: October 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION and ORDER 36 to amend 31 Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/15/2011. Deadline to re-file Motion for Summary Judgment is now 7/11/2012. Opposition to Motion scheduled for 9/6/2011. Reply in support of Mo tion to be submitted by 9/26/2011. Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment shall be set for 10/3/2011. Expert Witness Disclosure due on 12/12/2011 and Rebuttal Experts shall be produced on 1/9/2011. All Discovery to be completed by 3/30/2012. All Motions shall be tendered by 4/9/2012. Dates for Final Pretrial Conference and Jury Trial to remain the same. (Marciel, M)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 2/7/2011 DENYING HVM's 11 Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint. (Zignago, K.)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 1/18/2011 ORDERING that HVM LLC's Reply to Pltf's Opposition to HVM LLC's 11 Motion to Dismiss is due on 1/20/2011. (Zignago, K.)
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 12/27/10 ORDERING the hearing on HVM L.L.C.'s Motion to Dismiss 11 is RE-SET to 1/31/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb; pltf's opposition is due on 1/11/11; and HVM L.L.C.'s reply to pltf's opposition is due on 1/18/11. (Carlos, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soroka v. Extended Stay, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Soroka
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Extended Stay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HVM L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?