January 28, 2013 |
Filing
87
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/25/2013 ORDERING that, pursuant to the settlement, this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
|
December 20, 2012 |
Filing
85
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/19/12 ORDERING that dispositional documents shall be filed no later than 1/25/13. No further extensions will be granted.(Matson, R)
|
November 5, 2012 |
Filing
84
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/5/12 GRANTING 83 Request for Extension of Time to File Disposition Documents. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that dispositional documents shall be filed no later than 11/21/12. Failure to comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions on the party causing the failure to file dispositional documents. (Meuleman, A)
|
August 28, 2012 |
Filing
82
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/27/12 ORDERING that the Preliminary Injunction entered on 6/16/12 28 is disolved. The Clerk of is directed to pay to Plaintiff forthwith the funds which have heretofore been deposited into escrow under the 6/16/11 order. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the Court's Financial Office.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
August 9, 2012 |
Filing
74
AMENDED STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/9/2012. Settlement Conference continued to 8/24/2012 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 26. If the matter does not settle at the Mandatory Settlement Conference, the Parties are ordered to notify the Court with ten days of the settlement conference that the case has not settled, at which time the Court will resolve Defendant's currently pending Motion to Dismiss. (Owen, K)
|
June 15, 2012 |
Filing
69
STIPULATION and ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/15/2012. The Settlement Conference previously set for 6/18/2012 is CONTINUED to 8/10/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 26 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Settlement Statements due at least 7 days prior to the conference.(Owen, K)
|
May 23, 2012 |
Filing
66
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/22/2012 SETTING a Settlement Conference for 6/18/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 26 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney; ORDERING all counsel to attend in person; INSTRUCTING counsel to have a principal with all settlement authority present, or to be fully authorized to settle the matter on any terms; DIRECTING the parties to submit their Confidential Settlement Conference Statements 7 days prior to the Settlement Conference; ORDERING the parties to notify the Court within 10 days of the Settlement Conference if the matter is not settled at the Settlement Conference. (Michel, G)
|
April 17, 2012 |
Filing
60
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/16/12 APPOINTING Attorney Kresta Nora Daly for the limited purpose of opposing defendants' motion to dismiss as to Floyd Knapp. Appointed counsel shall notify Sujean Park if she has any questions re lated to the appointment; defendants' 29 Motion to Dismiss shall be heard by the undersigned; plaintiff shall file opposition briefing by 4/30/12; defendants shall file opposition briefing by 5/7/12; motion hearing set for 5/18/12 before the u ndersigned; the clerk of court is DIRECTED to serve a courtesy copy of this order on plaintiff at his email address, fhknapp@cwnet.com; the court DECLINES to adopt 41 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; and DENYING AS MOOT 52 Motion to Adopt the Findings and Recommendations. (cc: plaintiff; Sujean Park). (Meuleman, A) Modified on 4/17/2012 (Meuleman, A).
|
September 30, 2011 |
Filing
41
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/29/11 recommending that this action be dismissed re 1 Notice of Removal, filed by Chase Home Mortgage, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Federal National Mortgage Association. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Matson, R)
|
August 4, 2011 |
Filing
36
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/3/2011 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed with prejudice. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Zignago, K.)
|
July 21, 2011 |
Filing
34
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/20/11 GRANTING defendants to appear by telephone at the motion to dismiss first amended complaint set to be heard on 7/21/11 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 9, 13th Floor before the Honorable District Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Matson, R)
|
June 16, 2011 |
Filing
28
ORDER ADOPTING 27 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 06/16/11 and ORDERING that a PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION is entered restraining dfts from seeking to enforce an eviction order, including initiating c ontact with state authorities so that the eviction order may be enforced, assisting in enforcing the eviction order, including complying with fee payment requests associated with the eviction, or otherwise encouraging state authorities in enforcement of the eviction order. The Clerk shall set up an escrow account for this case, and plf is required to pay $600 per month into the escrow account by the first of each month, beginning 07/01/11; plf shall file a statement on or prior to the firs t of each month, served on all dfts, that such payment is being timely made. Failure by plf to submit the required money and file the required statement shall automatically, and without further order of the court, terminate the injunction. The Clerk shall disburse the funds in the escrow account to the holder of the note involved in this case upon dismissal of this case or in six month intervals, whichever comes first (cc: Financial). (Benson, A.)
|
June 10, 2011 |
Filing
25
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/10/2011 ORDERING that defendants shall show cause by 6/15/2011 at 4:00 PM why they should not be enjoined from attempting to enforce any eviction notice against plaintiff. The court may order personal appearances at a later scheduled hearing. (Reader, L)
|
May 20, 2011 |
Filing
23
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/19/2011. Defendants'11/3/2010 5 Motion to Dismiss, as amended on 3/24/2011 21 Motion to Dismiss, is VACATED as MOOT. Plaintiff's 15 Request to file an Amended Complaint is GRANTED. The proposed Amended Complaint, filed as Exhibit 1 to 15 Opposition, is DEEMED filed as of this date. Defendants shall file and serve a Response w/in 28 days of this Order. (Marciel, M)
|
February 23, 2011 |
Filing
20
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/22/11, ORDERING that this case is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. All current dates set before Judge Mueller are hereby VACATED. The parties are to contact Valerie Callen with regard to further case management.(Kastilahn, A)
|
January 4, 2011 |
Filing
10
ORDER and ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 1/4/2011. Defendants' 5 Motion to Dismiss Hearing is CONTINUED to 2/11/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD). Plaintiff's counsel shall file and serve his Opposition B rief or Notice of Non-Opposition no later than 1/28/2011. Defendants may file and serve a Reply on or before 2/4/2011. Plaintiff's counsel is ordered to SHOW CAUSE why he should not be sanctioned for failing to file an Opposition or Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion. Response to this Order to Show Cause shall be filed on or before 1/28/2011. (Marciel, M)
|