Salyer et al v. SSC Farms I, LLC et al
Appellee: SSC Farms I, LLC, SSC Farms II, LLC, SSC Farming, LLC and Bradley D. Sharp
Creditor: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Appellant: Scott Salyer and Scott Salyer Revocable Trust
Trustee: Office of the US Trustee (Sac)
Case Number: 2:2010cv02912
Filed: October 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/3/11 ORDERING that all proceedings regarding the Appeals are STAYED, and these appeals shall be administratively closed, pending further order of the Court, Pursuant Case s tay, the deadline for Appellants to file their opening brief and excerpts of record in the Appeals, and the deadlines for all other briefing thereafter regarding the Appeals are suspended and within seven (7) days after the Revised Budget no longer r emains in effect and either of the Parties determines that that it will no longer negotiate regarding extending the time period of the Revised Budget, such party will file with the Court and notice of expiration of the Revised Budget and a proposed o rder reopening the appeals, lifting the stay and issuing a revised briefing schedule, which in no event shall the deadline for Appellants to file their opening brief and excerpts of record in the Appeals be earlier than fourteen days after the date of the filing of the notice and proposed order and all other briefing thereafter regarding the Appeals shall be conducted in accordance with the rules of this Court and Bankruptcy Rules. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER 9 signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/2/2011 ORDERING that all proceedings regarding the Appeals are STAYED, pending further order of the Court. Within 7 days after the Revised Budget no longer remains in effect a nd either of the Parties determines that it will no longer negotiate regarding extending the time period of the Revised Budget, such party will file a notice of expiration of the Revised Budget and a proposed order lifting the stay and issuing a revised briefing schedule. (Zignago, K.)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/27/2011 ORDERING 7 Appellants opening brief and excerpts of record in the Appeals shall be filed on 3/17/2011, and the deadlines of all other briefing regarding the Appeals shall be determined under the rules of this Court and the Bankruptcy Rules. (Reader, L)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/19/11 ORDERING that the action denominated 2:10-CV-3467 MCE is reassigned to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton for all further proceedings. Henceforth the caption on all documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as No. 2:10-CV-3467-LKK. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Becknal, R)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/23/10 ORDERING actions 2:10-cv-2912 WBS, 2:10-CV-2913 FCD, AND 2:10-CV-2914 MCE are REASSIGNED to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton for all further proceedings; the caption on all documents filed in the reassigned cases shall now be known as 2:10-cv-2912, 2:10-cv-2913 LKK, and 2:10-cv-2914 LKK; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of these case to compensate for this reassignment. (Carlos, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salyer et al v. SSC Farms I, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SSC Farms I, LLC
Represented By: Larry Lichtenneger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SSC Farms II, LLC
Represented By: Larry Lichtenneger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SSC Farming, LLC
Represented By: Larry Lichtenneger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bradley D. Sharp
Represented By: Kevin W Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Creditor: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By: Jamie P. Dreher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Scott Salyer
Represented By: Paul Joseph Pascuzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Scott Salyer Revocable Trust
Represented By: Paul Joseph Pascuzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the US Trustee (Sac)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?