Hickman v. County of Butte
Petitioner: Clarence B. Hickman, Sr.
Respondent: County of Butte
Case Number: 2:2010cv02925
Filed: October 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Butte
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/12/11 RECOMMENDING that 28 MOTION to DISMISS be granted; and all other pending motions be denied as moot. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/20/2011 RECOMMENDING that ptnr's 15 amended petition for writ of habeas corpus be summarily dismissed, w/out prejudice, for failure to exhaust state court remedies and that all pending motions be denied as moot. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections due w/in 14 days. (Yin, K)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/7/2011 ORDERING that the 14 findings and recommendations are VACATED; and ptnr's 18 motion for the appointment of counsel is DENIED w/out prejudice. (Yin, K)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/15/10 recommending that this action be dismissed, without prejudice, for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with court rules and orders re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Clarence B. Hickman, Sr.. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Dillon, M)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 12 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/16/10. (Plummer, M)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/9/10 ORDERING that Petitioner shall submit on the form provided by the Clerk of the Court, within 30 days from the date of this order, a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with the certification required by Rule 3(a)(2), or pay the appropriate filing fee; and Clerk of the Court is directed to send petitioner a new form Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hickman v. County of Butte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clarence B. Hickman, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: County of Butte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?