Stringfellow v. McGinness et al
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Stringfellow
Defendant: John McGinness, County of Sacramento, Sacramento County Sheriff's Department, Erik Maness and Michael Sotak
Case Number: 2:2010cv02988
Filed: November 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/19/2011 ORDERING that w/in 14 days dft McGinness shall pay to the USM the sum of $56.02, unless w/in that time dft files a written statement showing good cause for his failure to waive service; and the clerk to serve a copy of this order on the USM. (cc: USM)(Yin, K)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/17/11 ordering the settlement conference previously scheduled to occur at U.S. District Court on 10/27/11 will be moved to the California Medical Facility but will still occur on 10/27/11. Total Renal Care Inc's motion to have its representative appear by telephone 38 is granted. (Plummer, M)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/13/2011 ORDERING that pltf's 36 motion is GRANTED in that, the 9/15/11 Order and Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is VACATED; the clerk to serve a copy of this order on the Custodian and the Out to Court Desk. (cc: OTCD) (Yin, K)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 09/21/11 ordering on 08/10/11 the undersigned issued a discovery and scheduling order with respect to several defendants that had answered the complaint. On 09/19/11 defendant Total Renal Care, incorrectly identified as Davita Dialysis answered the complaint. Therefore the 08/10/11 discovery and scheduling order shall be applied to Total Renal Care except that: ( Discovery due by 1/16/2012, All pretrial motions, except motions to compel discovery shall be filed on or before 4/13/2012.)(Plummer, M)
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 09/14/11 ordering the custodian to produce Robert Stringfellow at 9:00 a.m. on 10/27/11 before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD)(Plummer, M)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Robert Lee Stringfellow signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 12/10/2010. CDC is to collect an initial partial filing fee of $1.67 and thereafter the $348.33 balance and fwd to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of pltf's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial w/ a copy of this order. (cc: CDC, Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stringfellow v. McGinness et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Stringfellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McGinness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Maness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sotak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?