Advanced Home Health, Inc. v. Stellar Health Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Advanced Home Health, Inc.
Defendant: Stellar Health Systems, Inc. and Lim Nestor
Case Number: 2:2010cv03160
Filed: November 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER AMENDING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND CONTINUING TRIAL AND RELATED CASE MANAGEMENT DATES signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/4/12. Expert Witnesses Designation date 7/16/2012. Supplemental Expert Witness Designation 8/13/20. Discovery Cu t-off date: 8/20/2012. Expert Discovery Cut-Off Date: 9/14/12. Dispositive Motion Cut-Off Date: 10/3/2012. Motions In Limine Due: 10/10/12. Opposition to Motions in Limine Due: 10/17/2012. Optional Replies in SUPPORT of Motions In Limine Due: 10/24/2012. Joint Pretrial Conference Statement Due: 10/24/12. Trial Briefs Due: 10/29/12. Pretrial Conference is SET for 11/1/2012 at 03:30 PM. Trial is SET for 11/13/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/31/11: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 3/12/2012. Discovery due by 4/16/2012. Dispositive Motions filed by 5/16/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Trial set for 7/9/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Kaminski, H)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/1/2011 re 10 Notice of Related Cases ORDERING that pursuant to the stipulation of parties, the Stellar action (2:11-cv-666 KJM GGH) is consolidated with the instant action and is reassigned to the Honorable Kimberly J. Mueller for all purposes.(Waggoner, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanced Home Health, Inc. v. Stellar Health Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Home Health, Inc.
Represented By: Wesley C. J. Ehlers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stellar Health Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lim Nestor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?