Cahill v. Harrington et al
Plaintiff: John Michael Cahill
Defendant: R.L. Harrington, Scott Heatly and Jahal Soltamian-Zedeki
Case Number: 2:2010cv03181
Filed: November 24, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/10/2012 ORDERING the clerk to randomly assign a US District Judge to this action; and RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed. Assigned and Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/1/11 ORDERING that Within 30 days of the date of this order, dft Harrington shall show cause as to why the court should not enter default judgment against him pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a); and the Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on dft Harrington at Mule Creek State Prison and a courtesy copy of this order on Monica Anderson, Supervising Deputy Attorney General at the California Attorney General's Office. (cc Monica Anderson, SDAG)(Becknal, R)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of John Michael Cahill signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/8/2011. CDC is to collect monthly payments and fwd to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of pltf's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial w/ a copy of this order. (cc: CDC, Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cahill v. Harrington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Michael Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.L. Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Heatly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jahal Soltamian-Zedeki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?