Albrecht v. Bridgestone Americas Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Albrecht
Defendant: Bridgestone Americas, Inc., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC, BFS Retail and Commercial Operations, LLC, Firestone Tire Co., Firestone Rubber and Firestone Tire and Service Centers
Case Number: 2:2010cv03236
Filed: December 3, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER 24 for Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/9/2012. Parties stipulate that pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) and (2) this action shall be DISMISSED, with prejudice, in its entirety. (Marciel, M)
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/18/11 ORDERING that the parties shall complete Initial Disclosures by 9/9/2011. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 2/25/11 ORDERING this matter be reassigned to the Honorable Gregory G. Hollows. The parties shall take note that all documents filed with the Clerk shall bear case No. 2:10-cv-3236 GGH. All currently scheduled dates presently set before Judge Damrell are hereby vacated.(Matson, R)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: PRESERVATION AND INSPECTION OF PHYSICALEVIDENCE signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 02/14/11. (Williams, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albrecht v. Bridgestone Americas Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Albrecht
Represented By: R Nicholas Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgestone Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Arnold D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC
Represented By: Arnold D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC
Represented By: Arnold D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BFS Retail and Commercial Operations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firestone Tire Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firestone Rubber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firestone Tire and Service Centers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?