May 16, 2013 |
Filing
61
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, recommending that action be dismissed with prejudice and Clerk be directed to close this case, signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/15/2013. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Within 14 days after being served with these F/Rs, any party may file written Objections with Court and serve a copy on all parties. (Marciel, M)
|
March 28, 2013 |
Filing
57
ORDER ADOPTING 52 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, in full, signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 3/27/2013. Defendants' 44 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff's 43 Second Amended Complaint is DISMISSED in its entirety with leave to amend only as set forther in Magistrate Judge Brennan's 52 Findings and Recommendations. Plaintiff is GRANTED 45 days from date of Order to file the Third Amended Complaint. (Marciel, M)
|
March 8, 2013 |
Filing
52
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/8/2013 ORDERING plaintiff's 51 Request to file electronically is GRANTED; Clerk shall contact plaintiff in order to facilitate his participation in the CM /ECF system; RECOMMENDING 44 Motion to Dismiss be granted; and plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint be dismissed in its entirety, with leave to amend only as set forth; plaintiff's be granted 45 days from the date of service of any order adopting the findings and recommendation to file a third amended complaint. Matter referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. Any party may file objections to these findings and recommendations within 14 days after being served; failure to file objections within the specified time may waive the right to appeal. (Waggoner, D)
|
October 26, 2011 |
Filing
38
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/26/11 ORDERING that plaintiff's 37 request for an extension of time to file a second amended complaint is GRANTED; and the amended complaint is due by 12/16/11. Defendants shall file a response to plaintiff's amended complaint within 14 days from the date a second amended complaint is filed. (Kastilahn, A)
|
September 29, 2011 |
Filing
36
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 9/28/11 ORDERING that the Proposed FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 9/1/11 32 are ADOPTED. Defendants' MOTION TO DISMISS 16 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is DISMISSED i n its entirety. Plaintiff is GRANTED thirty days from the date of service of this order to file a second amended complaint. Plaintiff's MOTION for declaratory judgment 19 is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff's Request for an extension to serve the Doe defendants 30 is DENIED as moot. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
September 1, 2011 |
Filing
32
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/1/2011 ORDERING that the status (pretrial scheduling) conference set for 9/21/2011 is VACATED. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Dfts' 16 Motion to Dismiss be granted . Pltf's 11 First Amended Complaint be dismissed. Pltf be granted 30 days to file a Second Amended Complaint. Pltf's 19 Motion for Declaratory Judgment be denied without prejudice. Pltf's 30 Request for Extension of Time be denied as moot. Motions referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Zignago, K.)
|
February 9, 2011 |
Filing
23
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/9/11; ORDERING 21 Motion is denied as moot; Plaintiff's request for a continuance of the eharing on defendants' motion to dismiss is granted; MOTION HEARING as to 19 Motion and [16 ] Motion to Dismiss is reset for 3/23/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. Initial Scheduling Conference is reset for 6/15/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Matson, R)
|
February 8, 2011 |
Filing
22
ORDER ADOPTING 8 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 2/7/2011. Plaintiff's 6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or, in the alternative, for Preliminary Injunction, is DENIED. (Marciel, M)
|
December 30, 2010 |
Filing
15
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/29/2010 ORDERING that Defendants' 9 motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot and the February 2, 2011 hearing on that motion is VACATED. (Duong, D)
|
December 22, 2010 |
Filing
8
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/22/10, ORDERING that pltf's 7 ex parte appl for leave to submit redacted declarations is DENIED. It is RECOMMENDED that pltf's 6 motion for a tro be denied. Motion referred to Judge Burrell. Within 14 days after being served with these f&r's any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. (Kastilahn, A)
|