Wadhwa v. Aurora Loan Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sunil Wadhwa and Lynn Wadhwa
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Marin Conveyancing Corporation
Case Number: 2:2010cv03361
Filed: December 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 6/28/2011 ORDERING that this action be, and the same hereby is, DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. CASE CLOSED. (Duong, D)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 6/16/11, ORDERING that within seven days of the date of this order, plaintiffs shall file a brief on the issue of whether the court has subject matter jurisdiction.(Kastilahn, A)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 6/7/11 ORDERING that the actions denominated Wadhwa, et al. v. Aurora Loan Services, LLC et al., Civ. No. 2:10- 03361 WBS DAD and Wadhwa, et al., v. Aurora Loan Services, LLC, et al., Civ. No. 2:11-01525 FCD GGH, be, and the same hereby are, deemed related and the case denominated Wadhwa, et al., v. Aurora Loan Services, LLC, et al., Civ. No. 2:11-01525 FCD GGH, shall be reassigned to the Honorable WILLIAM B. SHUBB and Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd f or all further proceedings. Any dates currently set in the reassigned case only are hereby VACATED. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as Wadhwa, et al., v. Aurora Loan Services, LLC, et al., Civ. No. 2:11-01525 WBS DAD; the Clerk of the Court make appropriated adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Becknal, R)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 2/9/11: 13 MOTION to dismiss plaintiffs' Complaint be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Plaintiffs have twenty days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint, if they can do so consistent with this Order. (Kaminski, H)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 1/27/2011 GRANTING 8 Motion to Remand filed by Aurora Loan Services, LLC, CASE REMANDED to the Superior Court of the State of California, County of El Dorado. The Complaint 2 which originally iniated this action is unaffected by this Order. (cc: Copy of remand order to Superior Court).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wadhwa v. Aurora Loan Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunil Wadhwa
Represented By: Holly S. Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Wadhwa
Represented By: Holly S. Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Andrew W. Noble
Represented By: Laurie Howell
Represented By: Eric Gene Fernandez
Represented By: David R. Endres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew W. Noble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew W. Noble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marin Conveyancing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?