Randolph v. FEDEX-Federal Express Corporation
Plaintiff: Shawn L. Randolph
Defendant: FEDEX-Federal Express Corporation
Case Number: 2:2011cv00028
Filed: January 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 1/27/2015 GRANTING defendant FedEx's 78 Motion for Summary Judgment. This action shall be CLOSED and Judgment entered in favor of defendant. (Marciel, M)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/5/13. Both parties now appearing by counsel, the referral to the magistrate judge is WITHDRAWN. However, the magistrate judge shall CONTINUE to perform all duties described in Local Rule 302(c)(1)(20). (Meuleman, A)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 10/1/13 ORDERING Defendant's dismissal motion filed on 12/27/12 (ECF 55 and 56 ) is granted. However, Plaintiff is granted leave until 10/25/13, to file a Second-Amended Complaint addressing t he deficiencies in her First Amended Complaint raised in Defendant's dismissal motion. Further, Plaintiff is warned that this lawsuit may be dismissed with prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) if Plaintiff fails to file a Second-Amended Complaint on or before 10/25/13. (Becknal, R)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/9/13 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. Matter referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.. (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 4/9/2013 (Kastilahn, A).
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/24/2013 VACATING the 1/31/2013 hearing on the 55 MOTION to DISMISS. The motion is SUBMITTED on the record. (Donati, J)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 11/26/12 ORDERING that Defendant's 34 dismissal motion is GRANTED. However, Plaintiff is GRANTED leave until 12/14/2012 to file a First-Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is warned that this lawsuit may be dismissed with prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) if Plaintiff fails to file a First-Amended Complaint on or before 12/14/2012. (Kastilahn, A)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/20/12 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Motion to Dismiss referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.. Within14 after being served with these findings and recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. (Kastilahn, A)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 06/13/12 ORDERING that plaintiff's 45 Motion for Reconsideration to Appoint Counsel is DENIED. (Benson, A.)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/24/2012 VACATING the Motion Hearing as to 34 Motion to Dismiss set for 4/26/2012 at 10:00 AM; SUBMITTING the motion on the record. (Michel, G) Modified on 4/24/2012 (Donati, J).
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 04/11/12 ORDERING that defendant's 40 Motion to Strike is DENIED; although the Motion to Strike declarations is vacated from the calendar for 04/26/12, defendant's motion to dismiss will REMAIN on that calendar. (Benson, A.)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/26/12 DENYING 39 Motion to Appoint Counsel and DENYING as moot Motion to Continue Hearing. Pltf may appear telephonically at the 4/26/12 hearing on dft's motion to dismiss. Arrangements shall be made by contacting the courtroom deputy. (Manzer, C)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER vacating 28 Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/19/12. (Kaminski, H)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER VACATING 14 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/6/12: The Clerk of the Court is directed to issue forthwith, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve within 45 days of the date of this orde r, all process including a copy of this court's status order, without prepayment of costs. Plaintiff is directed to supply the U.S. Marshal, within 14 days from the date this order is filed, all information needed by the Marshal to effect service of process. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the U.S. Marshal. (cc: USM)(Kaminski, H)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/29/11 ORDERING that forthwith after submission of the paragraph 2 required info by pltf, the USM is directed to serve w/i 90 days, all process, including a copy of this court's status orde r, w/o prepayment of costs; Pltf is directed to supply the USM, w/i 14 days, all info needed by the USM to effect service of process, and shall file a stmt with the court that said documents have been submitted to the USM. In the event the USM is un able, to effectuate service on any dft w/i 90 days, the USM is directed to report that fact, and the reasons for it, to the undersigned; The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the USM. Pltf is cautioned that failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation of dismissal. (cc USM)(Becknal, R)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/18/11 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to issue forthwith, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve within n inety days of the date of this order, all process pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, including a copy of this court's Status order, without prepayment of costs. The Clerk shall send plaintiff one USM-285 form for each defendant, one summons, a copy of the complaint, an appropriate form for consent to trial by a magistrate judge, and this court's status order. Plaintiff is directed to supply the U.S. Marshal, within 14 days from the date this order is filed, all information needed by the Ma rshal to effect service of process, and shall file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the USM. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the USM, 501 I Street, Sacramento, Ca., 95814, Tel. No. (916) 930-2030. (cc: USM)(Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randolph v. FEDEX-Federal Express Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn L. Randolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDEX-Federal Express Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?