Hixon v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Forrest Larry Hixon
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2011cv00152
Filed: January 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 06/26/12 ORDERING that plaintiff's 17 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED; the Commissioner's 19 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED; Clerk to enter judgment in favor of Commissioner. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/3/2012 ORDERING that plaintiff's unopposed motion # 20 for an extension of time is GRANTED, and plaintiff shall file his reply brief on or before 2/13/2012. (Reader, L)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/14/2011. Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE in writing, no later than 12/23/2011, why action has not been prosecuted in accordance with timing requirements state in 5 Scheduling Order. On or before 12/23/2011, plaintiff shall take steps to prosecute this case. (Marciel, M)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/18/11: The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve the undersigned's scheduling order in Social Security cases. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order onthe United States Marshal. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hixon v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forrest Larry Hixon
Represented By: Ian Michael Sammis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?