Lassen Municipal Utility District v. Kinross Gold U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lassen Municipal Utility District
Defendant: Kinross Gold U.S.A., Inc. and Lassen Gold Mining, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2011cv00255
Filed: January 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/27/17 ORDERING that the action denominated 2:17-cv-02056-TLN CMK is REASSIGNED to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman for all further proceedin gs, and any dates currently set in 2:17-cv-02056-TLN-CMK are hereby VACATED. The Clerk of the Curt is to issue the Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order. The caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as 2:17-cv-02056-MCE- KJN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/12/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal is GRANTED. The instant lawsuit is accordingly dismissed, with prejudice. Since the action has now been concluded in its entirety, the Clerk of Court is directed to close the file. CASE CLOSED(Becknal, R)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION and ORDER 99 for extension of time signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/16/2015. Parties shall file Joint Final Pretrial Statement no later than 11/20/2015. (Marciel, M)
December 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL. 1/22/2015 Final Pretrial Conference is vacated and continued to 5/28/2015 at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 7. 3/16/2015 Jury Trial is vacated and continued to 7/20/2015 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 7. Signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/31/2014. (Deutsch, S)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/8/13 GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 27 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Manzer, C)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/6/13 GRANTING 82 Motion to Supplement Evidence. (Meuleman, A)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 10/29/12: Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 2/18/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; the parties shall file trial briefs not later than 12/5/2013; F inal Pretrial Conference is CONTINUED to 12/19/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; the joint final pretrial statement is due not later than 11/28/2013; any evidentiary or procedural motions are to be filed by 11/28/2013; oppositions must be filed by 12/5/2013 and any reply must be filed by 12/12/2013. The motions will be heard by the Court at the same time as the Final Pretrial Conference. (Kastilahn, A)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 05/25/12 ORDERING that the Discovery deadline is EXTENDED to 08/21/12; Designation of Expert Witnesses deadline EXTENDED to 09/21/12 with rebuttal expert disclosures now due 10/11/12. (Benson, A.)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/11/12 GRANTING 29 Ex Parte Application filed by Kinross Gold U.S.A., Inc., Lassen Gold Mining, Inc.; The hearing set for 27 Motion for Summary Judgment is continued to 7/12/2012 at 02:00 PM in Co urtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr. The deadline for Defendants to file any opposition is 5 weeks prior to the hearing date, or June 7, 2012. The deadline for Plaintiff to file any reply is 3 weeks prior to the hearing date, or June 21, 2012. (Matson, R)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/6/2012 DENYING 21 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend is DENIED as MOOT. (Reader, L)
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER of RECUSAL signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 2/3/2011. Clerk directed to randomly refer case to another judge. Magistrate Judge Kellison is RECUSED and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman is ASSIGNED for all further proceedings. (Marciel, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lassen Municipal Utility District v. Kinross Gold U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lassen Municipal Utility District
Represented By: Monica Sue Hans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinross Gold U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Craig C. Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lassen Gold Mining, Inc.
Represented By: Craig C. Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?