Harris v. Ventyx Inc et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Harris
Defendant: Ventyx Inc and United Health Care Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2011cv00308
Filed: February 2, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 8/12/2011 GRANTING 21 and 23 Motion for Judgment on the pleadings; Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED with leave to amend; Plaintiff is granted 15 days from the date of this order to file a first amended complaint in accordance with this order; Defendants are granted 30 days from the date of Plaintiff's first amended complaint to file a response thereto. (Waggoner, D)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER 30 to continue Hearings signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 5/23/2011. Defendants Ventyx and United Healthcare's 21 23 Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings Hearing is RE-SCHEDULED for 8/5/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD). (Marciel, M)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 5/9/11: HEARING as to 23 MOTION for JUDGMENT, 21 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT RESET for 6/24/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr.. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Ventyx Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ventyx Inc
Represented By: Stephen Bradley Perkins
Represented By: Brian T Ortelere, PHV
Represented By: Melissa D Hill, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Health Care Insurance Company
Represented By: Barbara J. Duffy, PHV
Represented By: Darin M Sands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Harris
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?