Roberts v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Michael James Roberts, Sr.
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2011cv00373
Filed: February 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/26/12 ORDERING that plaintiff's 16 motion for summary judgment is granted. The Commissioner's 21 cross motion for summary judgment is denied. This matter is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this order. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment and close this file. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/17/11 APPROVING plaintiff's time to reply to 21 CROSS MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Reply due 12/15/2011. (Meuleman, A)
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/05/11 ORDERING that the due date for dft's opposition to the 16 Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 10/26/11. (Benson, A.)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 09/08/11 ORDERING that because plf has now informed the court regarding Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, the 08/11/11 13 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. (Benson, A.)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/10/2011 ORDERING that Pltf shall SHOW CAUSE, within 30 days, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to inform the court regarding consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, as required by the court's scheduling order. The Clerk to send Pltf a consent form. The court's 6 order to show cause is DISCHARGED. (Zignago, K.)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/15/2011 ORDERING Pltf to SHOW CAUSE, within 30 days, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to submit service documents to the USM. (Zignago, K.)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/2/11: Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis is granted 2 . The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve on plaintiff the undersigned's scheduling order in social security cases. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on USM. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael James Roberts, Sr.
Represented By: Ann M. Cerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Represented By: Tova D Wolking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?