Marpel v. Saukhla et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Marpel
Defendant: - Saukhla and Joseph Bick
Case Number: 2:2011cv00387
Filed: February 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/27/12 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Dillon, M)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/6/12 ORDERING that plaintiffs successor and/or representative is hereby informed that any motion for substitution must be filed with this court on or before June 26, 2012. If no motion for substitution is filed on or before June 26, 2012, this action will be dismissed. (Dillon, M)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/26/12 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 1/18/12 35 are ADOPTED, except for the sentence beginning on Page 9, line 15 and the excerpt at 9:26-10-:13; Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss 24 is GRANTED with respect to defendant Bick and DENIED with respect to Defendant Saukhla; This Action shall be remanded to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings; and The Clerk shall enter Judgemnt for defendant Bick.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/17/12 ORDERING plaintiff's motion to lodge additional documents 33 is granted. The clerk of the court is directed to randomly assign a district judge to this action. U.S. District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller randomly assigned to this action. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion to dismiss 24 be granted; This action be dismissed with prejudice; and judgment be entered for defendants Saukhla and Bick. MOTION to DISMISS 24 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/29/11 GRANTING 30 Motion for Protective Order. Discovery is stayed in this action until the court rules on defendants pending dispositive motion. (Dillon, M)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/23/2011. Plaintiff's 20 Motion to Amend 1 Complaint is DENIED. Defendants' 21 Motion for Extension of Time w/in which to file Response is GRANTED. They shall file responsive pleading w/in 30 days after filing date of this Order. (Marciel, M)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/6/11 ORDERING that the California Medical Facility is DISMISSED from this action; and 16 Motion to obtain additional service documents is DENIED without prejudice. (Dillon, M)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/31/11 DENYING without prejudice 10 and 11 Motions to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying without prejudice 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/22/2011. The time for complying with this court's 4 order is extended to 4/15/2011. (Waggoner, D)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/18/11 ORDERING the director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the prison trust account of Joseph Marpel to the clerk until the balance of $350 is pai d in full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Director of the CDC. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. (cc Financial, CDC Prisoner Payment Orders )(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marpel v. Saukhla et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Marpel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Saukhla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Bick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?