Webb v. Wachovia Mortgage et al
Plaintiff: Francies Webb
Defendant: Synergistic Acquisitions, Inc., NDEX West, LLC, Better Life Corporation, Kappel & Kappel Realtors, Inc., Encore Credit Corporation, World Savings and Wachovia Mortgage
Case Number: 2:2011cv00516
Filed: February 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/15/2012 DISMISSING CASE for lack of prosecution. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/3/11 ORDERING that Plaintiff is GRANTED one hundred and twenty (120) days to find replacement counsel and notify the Court of the name of her new counsel or if she elects to proceed pro se. Failure to notify the Court within 120 days may result in dismissal of this case for lack of prosecution.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/2/11: The hearing currently set for November 7, 2011 is VACATED. Defendant's application to appear telephonically at the hearing on Plaintiff's counsel's motion to withdraw at attorney is DENIED, as moot. The motion to withdraw is GRANTED 32 . Counsel is ORDERED to release all client papers and property to client within fifteen (15) days of the date of this order. Attorney Carl Frederick Schetter terminated. (Kaminski, H)
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 06/28/11 ORDERING that, in light of plf's counsel's intention to withdraw, further consideration of the status and 6 Motion to Dismiss is DEFERRED. (Benson, A.)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/4/2011. A new Status Conference is SET for 6/27/2011 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) and attorney Thomas K. Agawa is ORDER to personally appear at hearing. Mr. Agawa is also ordered to SHOW CAUSE in writing, w/in 14 days, why sanctions of $150.00 should not issue for failure to appear at 5/2/2011 Status Hearing. (Marciel, M)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/20/11 ORDERING the hearings on the motion to dismiss 6 and motion to strike 7 currently set for 4/25/11 VACATED; the court ORDERS that counsel for pltf is SANCTIONED in the amount of $150. 00. This sum shall be paid to the Clerk of the Court no later than 30 days from the date of this order. Counsel shall file an affidavit accompanying the payment of this sanction which states that it is paid personally by counsel, out of personal fun ds, and is not and will not be billed, directly or indirectly, to the client or in any way made the responsibility of the client as attorneys' fees or costs. Counsel for plaintiff is FURTHER ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing why this case should not be dismissed as a sanction, in accordance with Local Rule 110, for plts failure to respond to the 4/1/11 order to show cause. Counsel shall file a response to this order to show cause no later than 5/3/11. Failure to timely file a response to the order to show cause may result in dismissal of this action with prejudice. (cc: financial) (Carlos, K)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/1/11 ORDERING that Counsel for plaintiff is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing why sanctions should not issue in accordance with Local Rule 110, including a fine of $150 and/or dismissal of this case, for their failure to file an opposition or statement of non-opposition to the motions. Counsel shall file a response to this order to show cause no later than April 11, 2011. Hearing on defendant's 6 motions to dismiss and to 7 strike are CONTINUED to April 25, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiff shall file and serve his oppositions or statements of non-opposition on or before April 11, 2011. Defendant may file and serve its replies no later than April 18, 2011. (Duong, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. Wachovia Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synergistic Acquisitions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDEX West, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Keiji Agawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Better Life Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kappel & Kappel Realtors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encore Credit Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Savings
Represented By: Jeremy E. Shulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage
Represented By: Jeremy E. Shulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francies Webb
Represented By: Carl Frederick Schetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?