J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Jason Bernard Brown, Lawrence L. Brown and Jbeezy Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv00648
Filed: March 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 553
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/2/2022 GRANTING 31 Ex Parte Application. (Perdue, C.)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/6/12 ORDERING that Plaintiff may employ the services of Legalese Attorney Services to perform the duties and responsibilities of a levying officer; Legalese Attorney Services shall comply with the requirements of the California Code of Civil Procedure inthe enforcement of judgments. (Manzer, C)
December 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Jason Bernard Brown, Lawrence L. Brown, Jbeezy Enterprises, LLC signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/30/2011. (Zignago, K.)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/30/2011 recommending that plt's 17 motion for default judgment against defendants Jason Brown, Lawrence Brown and Jbeezy Enterprises, LLC, be granted. Judgment be entered against the defendants in the sum of $85,000 and This case be closed. MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days after these findings and recommendations are filed. (Duong, D)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/1/2011 ORDERING 13 that the Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/3/2011 is hereby VACATED; pltf shall also serve a copy of this order on the defendants and thereafter file a Certification of Service of this Order with the Clerk of the Court. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Bernard Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jbeezy Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?