J & J Sports Productions Inc. v. Torres
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Dulce Torres
Case Number: 2:2011cv00653
Filed: March 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/5/2014 AUTHORIZING Rezak Meyer Attorney Service to serve legal process in this matter including Writs of Execution; ORDERING that the U.S. Marshal's Service remain the Levying Officer. (Michel, G)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Dulce Torres, individually and doing business as Prime Time Bar and Grill, also known as El Malecon Bar & Grill signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 02/02/12; plaintiff is awarded statutory damages in the amount of $10,000, and $25,000 in enhanced damages, for a total award of $35,000. (Benson, A.)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/21/11 ORDERING that the Findings and Recommendations filed on September 23, 2011 13 are vacated; and RECOMMENDING that Plaintiff's application for defaul t judgment 8 against defendant Dulce Torres, individually and doing business as Prime Time Bar and Grill, also known as El Malecon Bar & Grill, be granted; the court enter judgment in plaintiff's favor with respect to its claims brought pursua nt to 47 U.S.C. § 605(a) and 47 U.S.C. § 553(a); the court award statutory damages in an amount of $10,000 to plaintiff, and $25,000 in enhanced damages, for a total award of $35,000.00; this case be closed and all future dates be vacated. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Becknal, R)
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/22/2011 RECOMMENDING that Pltf's 8 Motion for Default Judgment against dft Dulce Torres, individually and doing business as Prime Time Bar and Grill, also known as El Malecon Bar & Grill, be granted. The court enter judgment in Pltf's favor. The court award statutory damages in an amount of $10,000 to Pltf. This case be closed and all future dates be vacated. Motion referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Zignago, K.)
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/20/2011 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 10 amended hearing notice is disregarded. The hearing on plaintiff's application for default judgment shall remain on the undersigned's Septem ber 22, 2011 calendar. Plaintiff's appearance at the September 22, 2011 hearing is excused. If defendant does not appear at the September 22, 2011 hearing, plaintiff's application will be decided on the basis of plaintiff's brief and the record. If defendant appears at the September 22, 2011 hearing and expresses an intention to defend herself in this action, the undersigned shall conduct a second hearing on October 20, 2011. The Office of the Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on defendant at the following address: Dulce Torres 2518 East Fremont Street Stockton, CA 95205. (cc Dulce Torres) (Duong, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions Inc. v. Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dulce Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?