Crane v. McDonald et al
Plaintiff: Richard Joseph Crane
Defendant: Mike McDonald, Mike Evans, D.M. Mantel, Tucker, Edward Caden, Duncan, T. Felker and Davey
Case Number: 2:2011cv00663
Filed: March 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/24/2015 DENYING 108 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Richard Joseph Crane. (Reader, L)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/15/2014 ADVISING plaintiff that documents filed by plaintiff since the 9/30/2014 closing date will be DISREGARDED and no orders will issue in response to future filings. (Yin, K)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER denying 97 Motion for judicial notice signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 09/23/14. (Plummer, M)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/15/14 ORDERING that plaintiffs motion for stay (ECF No. 93 ) is DENIED. It is RECOMMENDED that defendants motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 77 ) be granted. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/26/2014 GRANTING defendants' 81 motion to file documents under seal; the Clerk shall SEAL the case documents submitted by defendants as Exhibit F to defendants' motion for summary judgment, until they are orderd unsealed by the court; and plaintiff shall file and serve an oppostition to defendants' motion for summary judgment no later than 30 days. (Yin, K)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/20/13 ORDERING that 73 Motion is GRANTED; defendants are granted an additional nineteen days, to and including September 3, 2013, to file their motion for summary judgment. Plaintiffs response to the motion is due forty-five days thereafter. (Dillon, M)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/13/13 ORDERING that plaintiffs 71 motion for an extension of time is granted; Plaintiff is granted 45 days from the date defendants file their motion for summary judgment to file a response; Plaintiffs August 1, 2013 request for the appointment of counsel 71 is DENIED; and Plaintiffs 71 motion for a temporary restraining order is DENIED. (Dillon, M)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/8/13 denying 64 Motion to Compel. (Dillon, M)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER ADOPTING 56 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, in full, signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/27/2013. Plaintiff's 31 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. (Marciel, M)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/25/2013 GRANTING plaintiff's 61 motion for an extension of time; plaintiff has 30 days to file and serve objections to the findings and recommendations, no further extensions will be granted; and plaintiff may file a motion to compel discovery no later than 4/22/2013. (Yin, K)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/6/13 RECOMMENDING that 31 Motion for Preliminary Injunction be denied. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/3/12 ORDERING that Plaintiffs November 26, 2012 motion for an extension of time 47 is denied as moot, as the court accepts plaintiffs reply filed on November 29, 2012; and Petitioners motion to appoint counsel 45 is denied. (Dillon, M)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/25/12 ORDERING that Defendant Davey must respond to plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction,filed on September 14, 2012 (Dkt. No. 31 ), within 14 days. In the interim, the Attorney Gene ral and defendant Davey must forthwith take any steps necessary to ascertain whether plaintiff is being denied outdoor exercise in violation of the Eighth Amendment; The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of the FAC (Dkt. No. 21 ); plain tiffs motion for preliminary injunction (Dkt. No. 31 ); and a copy of this order upon Monica Anderson, Supervising Deputy Attorney General. In addition, the Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of the FAC (Dkt. No. 21 ); plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction (Dkt. No. 31 ); and a copy of this order to defendant Captain Davey, High Desert State Prison, P.O. Box 750, Susanville, CA, 96-127-750. (cc Monica Anderson)(Dillon, M)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/08/12 ordering plaintiff's in forma pauperis status is revoked for purposes of this action only, due to his 08/03/12 payment of the filing fee. The Director of the California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation and/or a designee shall cease collecting monthly payments from plaintiff's prison trust account in connection with this action. The clerk of the court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the Director of CDC. The clerk is also directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/8/12 ORDERING that plaintiffs claims against defendants McDonald and Felker are dismissed with leave to amend. Additionally, all claims except the Eighth Amendment denial of outdoor exercise cl aims against defendants Mike Evans, D. Mantel, and Davey, are dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order to amend his complaint to cure the deficiencies outlined in this order. Plaintiff is not required to file a Second Amended Complaint, but failure to do so will be construed as plaintiffs consent to the dismissal of the above-mentioned defendants and causes of action. (Dillon, M)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Richard Joseph Crane signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/2/2011. CDC is to collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance and fwd to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of pltf's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial w/ a copy of this order. (cc: CDC, Financial)(Yin, K)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/16/2011 ORDERING that w/in 30 days, pltf to complete and return the Notice of Submission w/ the required documents; the clerk to send pltf a new ifp application. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crane v. McDonald et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Joseph Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.M. Mantel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Caden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Felker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?