Johnson v. Kyeong Industrial Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Scott N. Johnson
Defendant: Angelica Avina Rodriguez, Muriel J. Bohr, Alejandro T. Martinez, Kyeong Industrial Inc. and Danny Rodriguez
Case Number: 2:2011cv00694
Filed: March 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER adopting 22 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 11/22/11 ORDERING that plaintiff's 20 motion for default judgment against defendants Kyeong Industrial Inc., individually and d/b/a Sams Teriyaki; Danny Rodriguez, individually and d/b/a Yaquis Taqueria; and Angelica Avina Rodriguez, individually and d/b/a/ Yaquis Taqueria is DENIED without prejudice. (Kastilahn, A)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/21/11 Recommending that Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Kyeong Industrial Inc., individually and d/b/a Sams Teriyaki, Danny Rodriguez indi vidually and d/b/a Yaquis Taqueria, and Angelica Avina Rodriguez, individually and d/b/a Yaquis Taqueria 20 be denied without prejudice. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to U.S. District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. Within fourteen days after being seved with these Findings and Recommendations, any party may file written objections with the Court and serve a copy on all parties. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 6/7/2011 re: 9 Stipulation and Proposed Order; Defendant Muriel J. Bohr shall have until 6/20/2011 to respond to complaint. (Waggoner, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Kyeong Industrial Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott N. Johnson
Represented By: Scott N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelica Avina Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muriel J. Bohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro T. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyeong Industrial Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?