Balbuena v. McDonald et al
Petitioner: Javier Balbuena
Respondent: M. D. McDonald and Immigration and Naturalization Services
Case Number: 2:2011cv00759
Filed: March 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/8/11 RECOMMENDING that 17 MOTION to dismiss be granted. Motion referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 21 days.(Dillon, M)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/24/11 ORDERING that petitioner's 18 motion for extension of time is GRANTED. Petitioner shall file a response to 17 the motion to dismiss within 60 days from the date of this order. Petitioner's 19 motion for access to his legal property is DENIED without prejudice. (Kastilahn, A)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 07/13/11 ORDERING that petitioner's 15 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED w/o prejudice to a renewal of the motion at a later stage of the proceedings. (Benson, A.)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/14/2011. Respondents directed to file a Response to 8 Amended Habeas Petition w/in 60 days from date of Order. The Answer or Motion shall be filed and served w/in 60 days from date of this Ord er. Petitioner's Reply, Opposition, or Statement of Non-Opposition shall be filed and served w/in 28 days after service of responsive pleading. Clerk shall serve a copy of this Order, Consent/Reassignment forms, and a copy of Amended Petition on Michael Patrick Farrell, Senior Assistant Attorney General. (cc: M. Farrell) (Marciel, M)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/10/11 DENYING without prejudice 7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/14/2011 ORDERING that the 2 application to proceed IFP is GRANTED; the petition is DISMISSED w/ 28 days to file an amended petition challenging a specific decision by the BPH. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balbuena v. McDonald et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M. D. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Immigration and Naturalization Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Javier Balbuena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?